U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 14, 2022: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • November 14, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2018
  • November 12, 2018: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • November 12, 2018: [--Transcript]
  • November 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2017: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 20, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 16, 2017: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.