U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • January 17, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • December 11, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 12, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 05, 2018: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received - formerly Rule 40]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Warrant ]
  • October 25, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • October 25, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.