U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardwick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Court Exhibit]
  • September 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • February 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Remark]
  • January 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • December 13, 2017: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 01, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.