U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 25, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • April 12, 2018: [Declaration]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • February 23, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 03, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.