U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dionicio-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 23, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • January 23, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • November 07, 2017: [Warrant ]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.