U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 10, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.