U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz-Espinosa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 21, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 16, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2018: [Exclude]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2017: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.