U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Exit Record]
  • October 18, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 07, 2020: [Alter Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 03, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 16, 2019: [Declaration]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2018: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • January 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • December 20, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.