U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Remark]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Document]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2020: [Unseal Document]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • September 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 27, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Seal Document]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 02, 2019: [Seal]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 10, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • January 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • January 08, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 08, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • January 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • January 08, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.