U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Exit Record]
  • March 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • June 03, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • June 02, 2021: [Transcript Purchase Order - Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [--Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 22, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2020: [Release from Custody]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • November 25, 2019: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • November 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • July 08, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 01, 2019: [Letter]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Report ]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 28, 2018: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • June 22, 2018: [Suppress Evidence]
  • June 22, 2018: [Suppress Statements]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 16, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 22, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 25, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • January 11, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.