U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:04-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Showell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report ]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • January 30, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.