U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diallo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Address updated]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 03, 2021: [Seal Document]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [--Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Seal Document]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Oral Order]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 07, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.