U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNeil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 13, 2022: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 02, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.