U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alburg et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 30, 2021: [--Transcript]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 08, 2020: [Exit Record]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 20, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 20, 2019: [Remark]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • February 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • February 11, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Bail]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 04, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 02, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.