U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Briggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [Information Unsealed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.