U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mantegna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Exit Record]
  • January 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2019: [Declaration]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 17, 2018: [Status Report ]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.