U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Directing Return of:]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.