U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00060-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hargraves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.