U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. De La Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • February 08, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 14, 2018: [Exclude]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 22, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • February 20, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.