U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 21, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 10, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2018: [Status Report ]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 26, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.