U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [--Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • May 05, 2021: [--Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 29, 2021: [--Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Remark]
  • March 19, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • March 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Declaration]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order for Jury Lunch]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • October 24, 2019: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Jury Trial Held]
  • October 23, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • October 21, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 10, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • October 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 03, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 18, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 14, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • April 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2019: [Status Report ]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • March 07, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • March 07, 2019: [Status Report ]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • January 14, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • January 02, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • January 02, 2019: [Letter]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 18, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • December 18, 2018: [Stay]
  • December 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 27, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2018: [Psychiatric Report]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2018: [Mail Returned]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 25, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2018: [Stay]
  • June 21, 2018: [Vacate]
  • June 19, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 05, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
  • May 31, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 30, 2018: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 30, 2018: [Compel]
  • May 30, 2018: [Stay]
  • May 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2018: [Compel]
  • May 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Stay]
  • May 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 12, 2018: [Change Venue]
  • April 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 28, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 28, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 19, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • March 08, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • February 28, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.