U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 23, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2018: [Downward Departure]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.