U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:02-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kossak et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.