U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Remark]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 08, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [USCA Appeal Information on Post Decision Matters]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • August 17, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • November 30, 2020: [--Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 04, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • September 04, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [New Trial ]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • July 02, 2019: [--Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • May 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Exhibits Returned]
  • May 08, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 08, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • May 07, 2019: [Jury Trial Held]
  • May 03, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 22, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 21, 2019: [Status Report ]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • January 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2018: [Produce]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • March 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.