U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cephas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • November 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 14, 2022: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • November 14, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [--Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • September 23, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 01, 2019: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • July 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 07, 2019: [Declaration]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 26, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 11, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [--Transcript]
  • November 08, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • October 30, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2018: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 25, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Oral Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 11, 2018: [Suppress Evidence]
  • June 11, 2018: [Discovery]
  • June 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Produce]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • March 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.