U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richardson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 05, 2021: [Redacted Document]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • December 02, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2019: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement Executed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement Executed]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Exclude]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • September 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • March 29, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.