U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Report ]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • December 04, 2020: [Status Report ]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 16, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • January 04, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2018: [Status Report ]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • May 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 20, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.