U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 23, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Remark]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • December 16, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Protective Order]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 14, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 13, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • April 04, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • April 04, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.