U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00024-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lendof
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 19, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Return of Property - PostTrial]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • June 14, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 12, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.