U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00025-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Pichardo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Exit Record]
  • February 19, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • May 17, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • May 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 12, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.