U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • October 29, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • October 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 23, 2018: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2018: [Court Exhibit]
  • April 23, 2018: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 23, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.