U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Exit Record]
  • August 31, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 08, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 17, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.