U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 15, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2018: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • April 24, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.