U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [--Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • January 11, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Other]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • January 12, 2021: [Redacted Document]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • September 18, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice - Other]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 20, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • June 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • April 24, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.