U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMahon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • November 06, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 05, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Declaration]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Protective Order]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • April 25, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.