U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campusano-Moreta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 05, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • July 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.