U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:99-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • November 04, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 12, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 30, 2018: [Address updated]
  • April 27, 2018: [Remark]
  • April 27, 2018: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.