U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Consiglio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • September 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 04, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 28, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • May 03, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • May 03, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 03, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.