U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiago-Roldan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 12, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 04, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.