U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation of Bail Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Revoke]
  • August 01, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • August 01, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Bail]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 08, 2018: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 15, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2018: [Bail Hearing - not revocation]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.