U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Webster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 25, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.