U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 01, 2020: [--Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 29, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 01, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • April 23, 2019: [Indictment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • April 02, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • November 26, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 15, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.