U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vurgich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 24, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • September 14, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • July 16, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 06, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 20, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • May 25, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 23, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 22, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.