U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alanis-Barrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • June 14, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • May 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.