U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flagg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 29, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 18, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • June 18, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.