U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cesar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • December 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 19, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.