U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Titus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • May 09, 2022: [--Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • March 21, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [--Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • July 22, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • July 21, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • July 20, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Hearing Out of Jury Presence]
  • July 15, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • July 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2021: [Jury Trial Held]
  • July 06, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • July 01, 2021: [Voir Dire Questions]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 15, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • June 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • June 14, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Seal Document]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2020: [Status Report ]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2020: [Status Report ]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Status Report ]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2018: [Status Report ]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2018: [Bail Hearing - not revocation]
  • June 27, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • June 26, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.