U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 10, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 23, 2018: [SO ORDERED - motion for bench warrant only]
  • August 23, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 15, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • August 15, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.