U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Velasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 07, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • August 07, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 29, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.