U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santillan-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 25, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • September 25, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 12, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.